Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Maria Pignone del Carretto, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1721Born
16 Dec 179169.9SelectedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
27 Feb 179270.1ConfirmedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
19 Mar 179270.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
27 Sep 179674.7DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Maria Pignone del Carretto
Bishop Emanuele Maria Pignone del Carretto O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOriolo Feudo

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 388
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast