Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Stefano Speranza

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1730BornVeroli
21 Dec 175424.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 177746.9AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
3 Aug 177747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
26 Jun 180271.8DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Stefano Speranza:
Bishop Pietro Stefano Speranza (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015