Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Andriani, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1705Born
14 Oct 172217.6ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
22 Apr 176560.1AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
1 May 176560.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
1 Apr 178479.1DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Andriani
Bishop Salvatore Andriani B. (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 254
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017