Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Mattei

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1721³BornAvezzano
13 Mar 174524.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 176039.9AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
21 Dec 176039.9Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
23 Jun 177655.4DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Mattei:
Bishop Benedetto Mattei (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015