Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ripanti

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1714BornJesi
19 Mar 176247.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Mar 176247.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 176248.0AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
20 Jun 176248.0Ordained BishopBishop of Orvieto, Italy
16 Mar 178065.8DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ripanti:
Bishop Antonio Ripanti (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

  • a priest for 17.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015