Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Pisani

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1630Born
22 Sep 166837.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 166838.1AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
16 Dec 166838.1Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
5 Aug 169059.8DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Pisani
Bishop Sebastiano Pisani (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a priest for 21.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast