Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Alexander VIII

Pietro Vito Ottoboni

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1610BornVenice
19 Feb 165241.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Feb 165241.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
12 Mar 165241.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
7 Dec 165444.6AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
27 Dec 165444.7Ordained BishopBishop of Brescia, Italy
15 Nov 166050.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
9 Jun 166454.1ResignedBishop of Brescia, Italy
13 Sep 167767.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
8 Jan 168069.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
1 Dec 168171.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
15 Feb 168372.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
10 Nov 168777.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
6 Oct 168979.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
16 Oct 168979.5InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 Feb 169180.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Pietro Vito Ottoboni:
Pope Pietro Vito Ottoboni (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 36.1 years
  • a cardinal for 37.7 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014