Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Gradenigo

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1636³BornVenice
9 Oct 166731.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 166731.7AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
20 Nov 166731.7Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
27 Feb 166831.9AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
13 Jul 168246.3AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
29 Jul 169862.4DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Gradenigo:
Bishop Bartolomeo Gradenigo (died ) Bishop of Brescia

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 168, and Page 370
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015