Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Grassi

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1632Born
1638²5.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 166735.4AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
9 Oct 166735.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
May 1677³45.0DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Grassi
Bishop Francesco Grassi (born , died May 1677) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChioggia

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 292
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast