Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Bonelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612²BornRome, Italy
16 Oct 165644.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
29 Oct 165644.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
16 Nov 165644.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
14 Jan 166452.0Elevated to Cardinal
Oct 1664³52.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
15 Apr 166553.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
27 Aug 167664.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bonelli (VIAF: 20617644)
Carlo Cardinal Bonelli (born 1612, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
  • a cardinal for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 21
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016