Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo de Mandia y Parga

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹Born
14 Oct 165246.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
14 Oct 165246.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Siriensis
9 Apr 166357.2AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
12 Dec 167266.9AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
20 Oct 167468.8DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo de Mandia y Parga
Bishop Rodrigo de Mandia y Parga (born 1606, died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Ferrol

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 102
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 79, and Page 317
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 197, Number 1,234
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast