Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Ciccolini

Deceased

Bishop of Forli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1624³Born
7 Jun 166641.6AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
13 Jun 166641.6Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
29 Apr 168863.5DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claudio Ciccolini
Bishop Claudio Ciccolini (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacerata, Diocese of Macerata e Tolentino
Ordained BishopSanta Maria di Loreto, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceForli, Diocese of Forli
Buried Place (Original)Madonna del Fuoco Chapel, Cathedral, Forli, Diocese of Forli

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 189
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017