Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo del Pozzo

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1622Born
20 Mar 164927.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 166846.8AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
16 Dec 166846.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
30 Oct 169472.7DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raimondo del Pozzo
Bishop Raimondo del Pozzo (born , died ) Bishop of Vieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,668, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast