Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Boscaroli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1627Born
17 Dec 167447.5AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
3 Feb 167547.7Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
23 Oct 167952.4DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Boscaroli
Bishop Francesco Antonio Boscaroli O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Caorle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLegnago, Diocese of Verona
Ordained BishopSant Ignazio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 141
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: AT, 27 May 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jul 2017