Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Matteo Giberti

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1495Born
8 Aug 152429.6AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
21 Dec 152429.9Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
1526²31.0AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
1528²33.0ResignedBishop of Lodève, France
Nov 1534³39.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1537¹42.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
30 Dec 154348.9DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Matteo Giberti (VIAF: 74583902)
Bishop Giovanni Matteo Giberti (born 1495, died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,093
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331, and Page 227
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018