Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Uberto Cardinal Gambara

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tortona

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1489BornBrescia
8 May 152839.3AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
Feb 1533³44.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
19 Dec 153950.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 154051.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
23 Mar 154152.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
15 Feb 154253.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare
17 Oct 154455.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
22 Mar 154859.2ResignedBishop of Tortona, Italy
14 Feb 154960.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tortona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Uberto Gambara:
Cardinal Uberto Gambara (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tortona

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013