Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin von Tetleben

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1488Born
30 Sep 153749.6SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
11 Jan 153849.9ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
22 Feb 153850.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
19 Apr 155163.1DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Valentin von Tetleben (VIAF: 1746794)
Bishop Valentin von Tetleben (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaucha
Ordained BishopSacristy of the Apostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Dec 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018