Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico de Cotes, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita


Events

DateEventTitle
22 May 1545AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
7 Jun 1545Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
1557²DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico de Cotes:
Bishop Ludovico de Cotes O.S.A. , Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 57, Number 317
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 107
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015