Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cristoforo Cardinal Madruzzo

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1512BornMadruzzo/Castel Nanno
5 Aug 153927.1SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
10 Nov 153927.3ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
28 May 154229.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
2 Jun 154229.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
1 Dec 154230.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
11 Dec 154230.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
17 Dec 154230.4SucceededBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
7 Jan 154532.5Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 154532.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
16 Jan 156047.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
13 Mar 156047.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
14 Apr 156148.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
18 May 156249.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
12 May 156451.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
14 Nov 156755.4ResignedBishop of Trento, Italy
3 Jul 157058.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
5 Jul 157866.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Madruzzo:
Cristoforo Cardinal Madruzzo (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a bishop for 36.1 years
  • a cardinal for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jun 1542
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Apr 2014