Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Fuchs von Fuchsberg

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Sep 1539SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
29 Oct 1539ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
21 Dec 1539Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
9 Dec 1542DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Christoph Fuchs von Fuchsberg (VIAF: 81596854)
Bishop Christoph Fuchs von Fuchsberg (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBrixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018