Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Picconi

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1885Born
18 Apr 190823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
13 Jun 194661.2AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
25 Jul 194661.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
21 Apr 195267.0DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Picconi
Bishop Antonio Picconi (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018