Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pius Vidi, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China

Titular Bishop of Cestrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1842Born
1857¹14.6ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
16 May 186523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
24 Aug 188644.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China
24 Aug 188644.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cestrus
9 Jan 188744.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cestrus
23 Mar 190057.8ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China
28 Aug 190664.3DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pius Vidi
Bishop Pius Vidi O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Italy

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 197
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017