Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ermolao Barbaro (Sr)

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1410Born
16 Oct 144333.7AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
16 Nov 145343.8AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
12 Mar 147161.1DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ermolao Barbaro (Sr) (VIAF: 27319301)
Bishop Ermolao Barbaro (Sr) (born 1410, died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast