Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Frangipane

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1804Born
22 Jun 182823.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Sep 182824.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 186561.0SelectedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
8 Jan 186661.4ConfirmedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
11 Feb 186661.5Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
27 Jan 187267.5DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Frangipane (VIAF: 307419010)
Bishop NicolÚ Frangipane (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Marco, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 221
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1866, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017