Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zaccaria Bricito

Deceased

Archbishop of Udine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1802BornBassano
1 May 182522.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 184643.5SelectedBishop of Udine, Italy
21 Dec 184644.1ConfirmedBishop of Udine, Italy
14 Mar 184744.4AppointedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
6 Apr 184744.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Udine, Italy
6 Feb 185148.3DiedArchbishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Zaccaria Bricito (VIAF: 88767260)
Archbishop Zaccaria Bricito (born , died ) Archbishop of Udine

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 577
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Dec 2016