Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomeo Gradenigo

Deceased

Archbishop of Udine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1704BornVenezia
24 Aug 173430.5AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy
24 Aug 173430.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
5 Sep 173430.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
12 Mar 175349.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Udine, Italy
13 Mar 176258.1SucceededArchbishop of Udine, Italy
19 Apr 176258.2InstalledArchbishop of Udine, Italy
2 Nov 176561.7DiedArchbishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Gradenigo:
Archbishop Bartolomeo Gradenigo (born , died ) Archbishop of Udine

  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 406, and Page 94
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 428
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013