Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odorico Giuseppe Rizzi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1858BornTobbiana, Italy
1880¹21.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
23 Jan 190243.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China
23 Jan 190243.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
5 Oct 190244.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
22 Mar 190546.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Odorico Giuseppe Rizzi:
Bishop Odorico Giuseppe Rizzi O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 76
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,594
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 37
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013