Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Carlo Valussi

Deceased

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1837BornTalmassons
24 Aug 185922.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
12 Feb 186023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
24 Apr 188649.2SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
7 Jun 188649.3ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
26 Jun 188649.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
10 Oct 190366.7DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Carlo Valussi:
Bishop Eugenio Carlo Valussi (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,716
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 566

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013