Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucio Soravito de Franceschi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Adria-Rovigo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1939Born
29 Jun 196323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
29 May 200464.4AppointedBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
11 Jul 200464.5Ordained BishopBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
18 Jul 200464.6InstalledBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
23 Dec 201576.0RetiredBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
6 Jul 201979.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Adria-Rovigo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lucio Soravito de Franceschi
Bishop Lucio Soravito de Franceschi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Adria-Rovigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMione di Ovaro, Archdiocese of Udine
Ordained BishopCathedral, Udine, Archdiocese of Udine
Death PlaceUdine, Archdiocese of Udine
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Udine, Archdiocese of Udine

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,652
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2015
  • d: CB, 6 Jul 2019
  • loc: AM, 8 Jul 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast