Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Brollo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Udine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1933Born
17 Mar 195723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
21 Oct 198551.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy
21 Oct 198551.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum
4 Jan 198652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum
2 Jan 199662.0AppointedBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy
3 Mar 199662.2InstalledBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy
28 Oct 200066.9AppointedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
7 Jan 200167.0InstalledArchbishop of Udine, Italy
20 Aug 200975.7RetiredArchbishop of Udine, Italy
5 Dec 201986.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Brollo (VIAF: 90400450)
Archbishop Pietro Brollo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Udine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTolmezzo, Archdiocese of Udine
Ordained PriestSan Martino, Church, Tolmezzo, Archdiocese of Udine
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Assunta, Church, Gemona del Friuli, Archdiocese of Udine
Death PlaceTolmezzo, Archdiocese of Udine
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Udine, Archdiocese of Udine

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Aug 2009
  • d: CB, 5 Dec 2019
  • loc: AM, 25 Jan 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast