Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Bruno Mazzocato

Archbishop of Udine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1948 Born
3 Sep 197224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
11 Oct 200052.1AppointedBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
9 Dec 200052.2Ordained BishopBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
3 Dec 200355.2AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
18 Jan 200455.3InstalledBishop of Treviso, Italy
20 Aug 200960.9AppointedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
18 Oct 200961.1InstalledArchbishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Bruno Mazzocato
Archbishop Andrea Bruno Mazzocato (born ) Archbishop of Udine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Trovaso

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Udine.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,867

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018