Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Cingari

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1748BornBologna
19 Mar 177425.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 180657.5AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
7 Apr 180657.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
14 Jun 181768.7DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Cingari:
Bishop Alfonso Cingari (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013