Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Calà

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1741Born
21 Sep 176524.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 180563.9AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
30 Jun 180563.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
1 May 181775.7DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Calà
Archbishop Vincenzo Calà (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 19
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018