Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio Cesare Zollio

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Bavaria

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1733BornRimini, Italy
27 Jun 178551.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
28 Oct 178552.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
10 Dec 178552.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
13 Apr 179561.6DiedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria

MicroData Summary for Giulio Cesare Zollio
Archbishop Giulio Cesare Zollio (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Bavaria

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 40
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016