Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michelangelo Lupoli

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1765BornFrattamaggiore
19 Dec 178924.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179732.1SelectedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
18 Dec 179732.2ConfirmedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
21 Dec 179732.2Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
20 Mar 181852.4SelectedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
25 May 181852.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
1 Mar 183165.4SelectedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
30 Sep 183166.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
28 Jul 183468.8DiedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Lupoli
Archbishop Michelangelo Lupoli (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 296
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 158, and Page 330
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016