Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Natale

Deceased

Bishop of Vico Equense, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1751Born
23 Dec 177524.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179746.1SelectedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
18 Dec 179746.3ConfirmedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
21 Dec 179746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
20 Aug 179947.9DiedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Natale (VIAF: 50112121)
Bishop Michele Natale (born , died ) Bishop of Vico Equense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasapulla
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 440
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 37
  • dd/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018