Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Bussi de Pretis

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1721³BornUrbino
21 Feb 179472.4AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
21 Feb 179472.4Elevated to Cardinal
13 Apr 179472.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 179472.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
12 Sep 179473.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
27 Jun 180078.7DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bussi de Pretis
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Bussi de Pretis (born , died ) Bishop of Jesi

  • a priest for 6.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1794
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016