Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Luca Solari

Deceased

Bishop of Brugnato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1732BornGenova
18 Dec 175624.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 179260.1AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
24 Jun 179260.1Ordained BishopBishop of Brugnato, Italy
26 Sep 181078.4DiedBishop of Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Luca Solari:
Bishop Giovanni Luca Solari (born , died ) Bishop of Brugnato

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014