Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Pavesi

Deceased

Bishop of Pontremoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1739³BornPontremoli
24 Jun 177030.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 179758.0AppointedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
25 Jul 179758.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
25 Jul 182081.0DiedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Pavesi:
Bishop Girolamo Pavesi (born , died ) Bishop of Pontremoli

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 92
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013