Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Arcamone, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1732Born
21 Dec 175523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
16 Dec 179159.0SelectedBishop of Lucera, Italy
27 Feb 179259.2ConfirmedBishop of Lucera, Italy
4 Mar 179259.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
13 Aug 179360.7DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Arcamone
Bishop Giovanni Arcamone C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSannicandro

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 267
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018