Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo Luigi Vecchietti

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1737BornFirenze
28 May 176325.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 179759.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
24 Jul 179759.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrum
25 Jul 179759.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrum
26 Jan 180163.2AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
Jan 1805³67.2DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Luigi Vecchietti
Bishop Raimondo Luigi Vecchietti (born , died Jan 1805) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 173, and Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016