Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Siciliani, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1740BornCamigliano
30 Nov 176424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
16 Dec 179151.0SelectedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
27 Feb 179251.2ConfirmedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
4 Mar 179251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
16 Feb 179554.2DiedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Siciliani:
Bishop Antonio Siciliani C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013