Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Silvestro (Jean Baptiste) Micc¨, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1746³BornNapoli
17 Oct 177327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
20 Jan 179245.3SelectedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
27 Feb 179245.4ConfirmedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
4 Mar 179245.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
29 Oct 180458.0AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
28 Jan 183083.3DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvestro (Jean Baptiste) Micc¨
Archbishop Silvestro (Jean Baptiste) Micc¨ O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 353
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 69
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1792, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016