Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Pescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1754BornPistoia
20 Sep 177723.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 180450.3AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
4 Nov 180450.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
2 Feb 183378.6DiedBishop of Pescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Rossi:
Bishop Giulio Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Pescia

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013