Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto Sinibaldi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ephesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1748BornOsimo, Italy
19 Jul 177829.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Aug 177829.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 180051.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
17 Aug 180051.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
Apr 1816³67.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Sinibaldi:
Archbishop Benedetto Sinibaldi (born ) Titular Archbishop of Ephesus

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013