Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Ferreri, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1740Born
20 Sep 180564.9AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
22 Sep 180564.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
Jan 1814³73.2DiedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Ferreri:
Bishop Francesco Maria Ferreri C.P. (born ) Bishop of Nicopoli

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013