Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Casali

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1743Born
20 Dec 176623.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 178743.7AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
13 May 178743.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
1814¹70.4DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Casali
Bishop Nicola Casali (born , died 1814) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesene

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 369
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018