Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gennaro Maria Guevara Suardo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1748BornNapoli
16 Mar 177122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Dec 179143.6SelectedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
27 Feb 179243.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
4 Mar 179243.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
29 Oct 180456.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Aversa, Italy
3 Aug 181466.2DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Maria Guevara Suardo
Archbishop Gennaro Maria Guevara Suardo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 116
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 100
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016