Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Maria Morelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1741Born
16 Jun 176423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
16 Dec 179150.6SelectedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
27 Feb 179250.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
4 Mar 179250.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
24 May 179251.0InstalledArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
22 Aug 182281.3DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Morelli
Archbishop Vincenzo Maria Morelli C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLecce

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 238
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018