Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Bartoli

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1755Born
15 Feb 177823.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 179439.0AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
16 Mar 179439.1Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
23 Dec 180146.9AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
19 Jan 181054.9DiedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Bartoli
Bishop Paolo Bartoli (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerni

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 92
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,794, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast